Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Cibo

Deceased

Bishop of Savona, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Mar 1317AppointedBishop of Savona, Italy
28 Nov 1328AppointedAdministrator of Albenga, Italy
4 Dec 1329CeasedAdministrator of Albenga, Italy
1342²DiedBishop of Savona, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Federico Cibo
Bishop Federico Cibo (died 1342) Bishop of Savona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 433, and Page 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Aug 2021

Quantcast