Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gervais de Chichester (d’Angles), O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Feb 1209AppointedAbbot General of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
20 Dec 1220AppointedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
18 Jul 1221Ordained BishopBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
28 Dec 1228DiedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France

MicroData Summary for Gervais de Chichester (d’Angles)
Bishop Gervais de Chichester (d’Angles) O. Praem. (died ) Bishop of Sées {Séez}

  • a bishop for 7.4 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 427
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,070

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast