Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolas de Cherizy

Deceased

Bishop of Soissons, France

Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica


Events

DateEventTitle
1176¹AppointedBishop of Soissons, France
9 Aug 1176Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons, France
10 Dec 1206AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
14 Sep 1207DiedBishop of Soissons, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas de Cherizy
Archbishop Nicolas de Cherizy (died ) Bishop of Soissons

  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 633, and Page 432
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,902
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 468, and Page 484

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Feb 2021

Quantcast