Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aymeric Chatti de la Joussac

Deceased

Bishop of Limoges, France


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Oct 1358AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
18 Aug 1361AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
18 Jul 1371AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
10 Nov 1390DiedBishop of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for Aymeric Chatti de la Joussac
Bishop Aymeric Chatti de la Joussac (died ) Bishop of Limoges

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 301, and Page 141
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 536

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Mar 2021

Quantcast