Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aime de Chantal

Deceased

Bishop of Vercelli, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1272³AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
21 Dec 1273AppointedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
19 Jun 1303DiedBishop of Vercelli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aime de Chantal
Bishop Aime de Chantal (died ) Bishop of Vercelli

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 521, and Page 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Aug 2021

Quantcast