Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillaume Cardinal de Chanac, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Sep 1368AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
8 Jan 1371AppointedBishop of Mende, France
30 May 1371AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
30 May 1371Elevated to Cardinal
21 Nov 1383AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
30 Dec 1383DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Chanac
Guillaume Cardinal de Chanac O.S.B. (died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris, France
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Dominicans, Church, Avignon
Buried Place (Current)Saint-Martial, Abbey, Limoges, Diocese of Limoges, France

  • a cardinal for 12.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 May 1371
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast