Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertrand de Chalancon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rodez, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1429¹Born
22 Apr 145728.3AppointedBishop of Rodez, France
2 Jun 149465.4ResignedBishop of Rodez, France
24 Oct 150172.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Rodez, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Bertrand de Chalancon
Bishop Bertrand de Chalancon (born 1429, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rodez

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 226
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1457, Number 22*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast