Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arnaldo de Cescomes

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Aug 1327AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
7 Oct 1334AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
9 Sep 1346DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Arnaldo de Cescomes
Archbishop Arnaldo de Cescomes (died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 283, and Page 479

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast