Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Cauchon de Somièvre

Deceased

Bishop of Lisieux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1371Born
21 Aug 142049.6AppointedBishop of Beauvais, France
29 Jan 143261.0AppointedBishop of Lisieux, France
18 Dec 144271.9DiedBishop of Lisieux, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Cauchon de Somièvre
Bishop Pierre Cauchon de Somièvre (born 1371, died ) Bishop of Lisieux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReims

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 132
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast