Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Altogrado Cattaneo

Deceased

Bishop of Vicenza, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Dec 1303AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
16 Jan 1306Ordained BishopBishop of Vicenza, Italy
1 Oct 1314DiedBishop of Vicenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Altogrado Cattaneo
Bishop Altogrado Cattaneo (died ) Bishop of Vicenza

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon, France

  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 526
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Number 8,672

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 12 Dec 2020

Quantcast