Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Antonio de Castro y Castillo

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Sep 1647SelectedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
13 Jan 1648ConfirmedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
26 Apr 1648Ordained BishopBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
7 Oct 1653DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Luis Antonio de Castro y Castillo
Bishop Luis Antonio de Castro y Castillo (died ) Bishop of La Paz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcala la Real

  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,970
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 270
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 178, Number 1,106
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast