Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luiz de Castro Pereira, C.S.J. †

Deceased

Prelate of CuiabŠ, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1768Born
25 May 179325.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 180335.8SelectedPrelate of CuiabŠ, Brazil
29 Oct 180436.7ConfirmedPrelate of CuiabŠ, Brazil
29 Oct 180436.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia
14 Jul 180537.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia
1 Aug 182254.5DiedPrelate of CuiabŠ, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz de Castro Pereira
Bishop Luiz de Castro Pereira C.S.J. (born , died ) Prelate of CuiabŠ

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1805, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 314

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast