Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri de Casaloci

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Apr 1302AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
28 Jul 1302Ordained BishopBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
29 Apr 1312DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Henri de Casaloci
Bishop Henri de Casaloci (died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAnagni, Diocese of Anagni

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 417
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 102, Number 8,795

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 22 Dec 2020

Quantcast