Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bartolomeo Carbone de Papazurri, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras), Greece


Events

DateEventTitle
30 May 1348AppointedBishop of Teano, Italy
24 May 1353AppointedBishop of Chieti, Italy
21 Jul 1363AppointedArchbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras), Greece
1365¹DiedArchbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras), Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Carbone de Papazurri
Archbishop Bartolomeo Carbone de Papazurri O.P. (died 1365) Archbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 481, and Page 394
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 480

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 May 2021

Quantcast