Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alfonso Cardinal Carrillo de Albornoz

Deceased

Administrator of SigŁenza, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati

Titular See: (Pseudocardinal)


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Sep 1408AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
22 Sep 1408Elevated to Cardinal
28 Nov 1408AppointedAdministrator of Osma, Spain
17 Sep 1422AppointedAdministrator of SigŁenza, Spain
Jan 1423³AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
14 Mar 1434DiedAdministrator of SigŁenza, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Carrillo de Albornoz
Alfonso Cardinal Carrillo de Albornoz (died ) Administrator of SigŁenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuenca

  • a cardinal for 25.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Sep 1408
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 383

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast