Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Jean de Cardaillac

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Administrator of Toulouse


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1313¹Born
8 Jun 135138.4AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
18 Jun 136148.4AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
18 Jul 137158.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
18 Jul 137158.5AppointedAdministrator of Rodez, France
8 Nov 137865.8AppointedAdministrator of Toulouse, France
1390¹77.0DiedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Cardaillac (VIAF: 42231020)
Patriarch Jean de Cardaillac (born 1313, died 1390) Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 144, and Page 82
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 119, and Page 488
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 427

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Feb 2021

Quantcast