Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diomede Cardinal Carafa

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Pier Damiani ai Monti di San Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1492Born
9 Apr 151119.2AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
20 Dec 155563.9Elevated to Cardinal
13 Jan 155664.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pier Damiani ai Monti di San Paolo
12 Aug 156068.5DiedBishop of Ariano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Diomede Carafa
Diomede Cardinal Carafa (born , died ) Bishop of Ariano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAriano, Diocese of Ariano
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 4.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1555
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1511, Number 9*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast