Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tommaso Cardinal da Capua

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateEventTitle
1216²AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
1216²Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jan 1216AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
18 Feb 1216ResignedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
13 Jun 1216AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
22 Aug 1243DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso da Capua
Tommaso Cardinal da Capua (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapua, Archdiocese of Capua, Italy
Death PlaceAnagni, Diocese of Anagni, Italy

  • a cardinal for 27.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1216
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 359

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Jul 2021

Quantcast