Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vittore Capello, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Famagusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1588²Born
20 Jun 163345.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
31 Jul 163345.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Famagusta
1648²60.0DiedTitular Bishop of Famagusta

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vittore Capello
Bishop Vittore Capello C.R.S. (born 1588, died 1648) Titular Bishop of Famagusta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 184
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 12
  • c3+: AT, 14 Sep 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,003

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast