Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Annibale Cardinal Capalti

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Studies

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1811Born
13 Mar 186857.1Elevated to Cardinal
16 Mar 186857.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
3 Jan 187058.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies
18 Oct 187766.7DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies

MicroData Summary for Annibale Capalti
Annibale Cardinal Capalti (born , died ) Prefect of Studies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 9.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast