Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de la Calle y Heredia, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Arequipa, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1612²Born
18 Feb 163422.1ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
5 Sep 166149.6AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
22 Oct 166250.8Ordained BishopBishop of Trujillo, Peru
1 Oct 167462.7AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
15 Feb 167664.1DiedBishop of Arequipa, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de la Calle y Heredia
Bishop Juan de la Calle y Heredia O. de M. (born 1612, died ) Bishop of Arequipa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranada
Ordained BishopSanto Domingo, Convent, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,848
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 195, Number 1,226
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1662, Number 21
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,802

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast