Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Cabeza de Vaca

Deceased

Bishop of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jan 1377AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
1388¹ResignedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
15 Nov 1396AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
14 Mar 1407AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
1412¹DiedBishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Cabeza de Vaca
Bishop Juan Cabeza de Vaca (died 1412) Bishop of Burgos

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 151, and Page 201
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Apr 2021

Quantcast