Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Philippe Cardinal de Cabassole

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1305²Born
17 Aug 133429.6AppointedBishop of Cavaillon, France
18 Aug 136156.6AppointedAdministrator of Cavaillon, France
18 Aug 136156.6AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
23 Sep 136661.7AppointedAdministrator of Marseille, France
22 Sep 136863.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
22 Sep 136863.7Elevated to Cardinal
9 Dec 136863.9ResignedAdministrator of Marseille, France
31 May 137065.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
27 Aug 137267.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippe de Cabassole
Philippe Cardinal de Cabassole (born 1305, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCavaillon, Diocese of Cavaillon, France
Death PlacePerugia
Buried Place (Original)Carthusian, Monastery, Bon-Pas, Archdiocese of Avignon, France

  • a cardinal for 3.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Sep 1368
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 179, and Page 330

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast