Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joseph Buckley, S.M. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Society of Mary


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Aug 1961AppointedSuperior General of Society of Mary
8 Dec 1969CeasedSuperior General of Society of Mary
11 Sep 1981DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Society of Mary

MicroData Summary for Joseph Buckley
Father Joseph Buckley S.M. (died ) Superior General Emeritus of Society of Mary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUSA

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Aug 2021

Quantcast