Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Browne

Deceased

Bishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Oct 1483AppointedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
13 Jun 1484Ordained BishopBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
14 Jan 1514DiedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for George Browne
Bishop George Browne (died ) Bishop of Dunkeld

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Jacques des espangols, Place Navone, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 189
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1484, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 147
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 58, Number 4,275

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast