Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guillaume de Brosse

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens, France


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Oct 1317AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
14 Feb 1318AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
27 Feb 1321AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
14 Dec 1330AppointedArchbishop of Sens, France
13 Dec 1338DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Brosse
Archbishop Guillaume de Brosse (died ) Archbishop of Sens

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 448, and Page 138
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 334, and Page 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Feb 2021

Quantcast