Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillaume Cardinal Bragose

Deceased

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Aug 1361AppointedBishop of Vabres, France
17 Sep 1361AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
17 Sep 1361Elevated to Cardinal
6 Dec 1362AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
Aug 1367³AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
8 Nov 1367DiedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Bragose
Guillaume Cardinal Bragose (died ) Major Penitentiary of Apostolic Penitentiary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMende, Diocese of Mende, France
Buried Place (Original)S. Lorenzo in Lucina, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 6.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 511
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Sep 1361

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Feb 2021

Quantcast