Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert de Bosco (Bose), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mende, France


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jun 1386AppointedBishop of Alet, France
27 May 1390AppointedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
17 Oct 1390AppointedBishop of Mende, France
1408¹DiedBishop of Mende, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert de Bosco (Bose)
Bishop Robert de Bosco (Bose) O.S.B. (died 1408) Bishop of Mende

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 342, and Page 203
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 237

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast