Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bompar Virgili

Deceased

Bishop of Mende, France


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Aug 1366AppointedBishop of Uzs, France
16 Jun 1371AppointedBishop of Mende, France
31 Jul 1375DiedBishop of Mende, France

MicroData Summary for Bompar Virgili
Bishop Bompar Virgili (died ) Bishop of Mende

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 511, and Page 342
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 577

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Feb 2021

Quantcast