Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Boiardi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ferrara, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1400²AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
1400²Ordained BishopBishop of Modena, Italy
24 Jan 1401AppointedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
11 May 1430ResignedBishop of Ferrara, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Boiardi
Bishop Pietro Boiardi , Bishop Emeritus of Ferrara

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 248, and Page 353
  • r: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 153
  • ln/r: CB, 2 Oct 2020
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 245, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Aug 2021

Quantcast