Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Boissy

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens, France


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Oct 1380AppointedBishop of Mācon, France
29 Mar 1389AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
4 Sep 1410DiedBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Boissy
Bishop Jean de Boissy (died ) Bishop of Amiens

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 330, and Page 331
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast