Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antoine Cardinal Bohier du Prat, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges, France

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1460¹Born
13 Nov 151454.8AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
1 Apr 151757.2Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 151757.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
27 Nov 151959.9DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine Bohier du Prat (VIAF: 279896536)
Antoine Cardinal Bohier du Prat O.S.B. (born 1460, died ) Archbishop of Bourges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIssoire
Death PlaceBlois

  • a cardinal for 2.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Apr 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 135
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1514, Number 40*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast