Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Blunville

Deceased

Bishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Nov 1226AppointedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
20 Dec 1226Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
16 Aug 1236DiedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Blunville
Bishop Thomas Blunville (died ) Bishop of Norwich

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSte. Catherine, Westminster

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 56
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 460
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 90, Number 7,538

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast