Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco de Blanes

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Sep 1408AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
19 Dec 1408AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
18 Feb 1410DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francesco de Blanes
Bishop Francesco de Blanes (died ) Bishop of Barcelona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 128, and Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Apr 2021

Quantcast