Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca Bertini, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Siena, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Mar 1373AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
2 Oct 1377AppointedBishop of Siena, Italy
1 Oct 1384DiedBishop of Siena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luca Bertini
Bishop Luca Bertini C.R.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Siena

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 446, and Page 357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Jun 2021

Quantcast