Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christophe Berti

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Aug 1437AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
18 May 1438Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
21 Aug 1444DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Christophe Berti
Bishop Christophe Berti (died ) Bishop of Foligno

EventPlace
Ordained BishopFerrara, Diocese of Ferrara

  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 156
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,337

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast