Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Arnaud Cardinal Bernard du Pouget

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Aug 1348AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
16 Jun 1361AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
16 Jun 1361AppointedAdministrator of Montauban, France
Sep 1368²ResignedAdministrator of Montauban, France
22 Sep 1368AppointedCardinal-Priest
22 Sep 1368Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 1368DiedCardinal-Priest

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Arnaud Bernard du Pouget
Arnaud Cardinal Bernard du Pouget (died ) Cardinal-Priest

EventPlace
Birth PlacePouget, France
Death PlaceViterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Franciscan, Church, Viterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

  • a cardinal for -.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 82, and Page 347
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 96
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Sep 1368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast