Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David de Berhnam

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jun 1239SelectedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
1 Oct 1239ConfirmedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
22 Jan 1240Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
26 Apr 1253DiedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for David de Berhnam
Bishop David de Berhnam (died ) Bishop of Saint Andrews

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaint Andrews, Diocese of Saint Andrews, Scotland
Death PlaceNarthanthira
Buried Place (Original)Kelso

  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 88
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 94, Number 7,944

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 22 Nov 2020

Quantcast