Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gilles Aycelin Cardinal de Bellèmere

Deceased

Bishop of Avignon, France

Note/Previous Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Oct 1382AppointedBishop of Lavaur, France
17 Oct 1390AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
19 Aug 1392AppointedBishop of Avignon, France
1394²Elevated to Cardinal
1407¹DiedBishop of Avignon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gilles Aycelin de Bellèmere
Gilles Aycelin Cardinal de Bellèmere (died 1407) Bishop of Avignon

  • a cardinal for 13.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1394
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 92, and Page 518
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Mar 2021

Quantcast