Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger de Beaumont

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Apr 1189³AppointedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
15 Feb 1198Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
7 Jul 1202DiedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Roger de Beaumont
Bishop Roger de Beaumont (died ) Bishop of Saint Andrews

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaint Andrews, Diocese of Saint Andrews, Scotland
Death PlaceCambuskenneth
Buried Place (Original)Old Church of St. Andrews

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 236
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 88
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 94, Number 7,937

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 22 Nov 2020

Quantcast