Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Bauffès

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1375AppointedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
4 Dec 1391AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
9 Sep 1393AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
17 Aug 1403AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
Oct 1403³DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Bauffès
Bishop Jean Bauffès (died Oct 1403) Bishop of Lérida

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 97, and Page 526
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 379, and Page 283

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast