Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo , O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Comacchio, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Sep 1319AppointedBishop of Konavlje, Albania
23 Jun 1320AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
30 Jul 1333AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
1348²DiedBishop of Comacchio, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo
Bishop Bartolomeo O.P. (died 1348) Bishop of Comacchio

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 451, and Page 199
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 218

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Jun 2021

Quantcast