Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Remig Sándor Bárdos, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1868Born
29 Jun 188820.3ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
3 Jul 189224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
19 May 192052.2AppointedAbbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary
12 May 193264.2DiedAbbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Remig Sándor Bárdos
Abbot Remig Sándor Bárdos O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Pannonhalma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIpolyság
Death PlaceBalatonfüred

  • a priest for 39.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Apr 2021

Quantcast