Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lukács Szegedi Baratin

Deceased

Bishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jan 1491AppointedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
4 Nov 1493AppointedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
24 Jul 1500AppointedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
22 Sep 1510DiedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Lukács Szegedi Baratin
Bishop Lukács Szegedi Baratin (died ) Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 271, and Page 124
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 109
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1491, Number 13*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast