Catholic-Hierarchy DC

István Cardinal Bánsca

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateEventTitle
1241²AppointedBishop of Vác, Hungary
7 Jul 1243AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
Dec 1251³Elevated to Cardinal
Dec 1251³AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
31 Dec 1252AppointedAdministrator of Esztergom, Hungary
7 Jun 1253ResignedAdministrator of Esztergom, Hungary
9 Jul 1270DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for István Bánsca
István Cardinal Bánsca (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHungary
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Balbina, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 18.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, Dec 1251
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 464, and Page 511

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 Apr 2021

Quantcast