Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal Aycelin de Montaigut, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Former Administrator of Alet, France

Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1320¹Born
2 Aug 136141.5AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
8 Jan 137151.0AppointedBishop of Laon, France
23 Dec 138363.9AppointedAdministrator of Laon, France
23 Dec 138363.9Elevated to Cardinal
1385²65.0ResignedAdministrator of Laon, France
25 Apr 138565.3AppointedAdministrator of Alet, France
1386²66.0ResignedAdministrator of Alet, France
8 Nov 138868.8DiedFormer Administrator of Alet, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Aycelin de Montaigut
Pierre Cardinal Aycelin de Montaigut O.S.B. (born 1320, died ) Former Administrator of Alet

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiocese of Clermont
Death PlaceReims, Archdiocese of Reims
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Martin des Champs, Abbey, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a cardinal for 4.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 369, and Page 296
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 237
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 1383

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Feb 2021

Quantcast