Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gilles Cardinal Aycelin de Montaigut

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Mar 1356AppointedBishop of Thérouanne, France
17 Sep 1361AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
17 Sep 1361Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jul 1368AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
5 Dec 1378DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Gilles Aycelin de Montaigut
Gilles Cardinal Aycelin de Montaigut (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAuvergne
Death PlaceAvignon

  • a cardinal for 17.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 351
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Sep 1361

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Feb 2021

Quantcast