Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Seguin d’Auton

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

Administrator of Tours


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jan 1380AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
20 Jun 1380AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
20 Jun 1380AppointedAdministrator of Nīmes, France
8 Oct 1383AppointedAdministrator of Tours, France
25 Mar 1395DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

MicroData Summary for Seguin d’Auton
Patriarch Seguin d’Auton (died ) Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 94, and Page 503
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 361

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Feb 2021

Quantcast