Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Étienne Cardinal Aubert (Jr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Mar 1361AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
17 Sep 1361AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
17 Sep 1361Elevated to Cardinal
1368²Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 1368AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
29 Sep 1369DiedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Étienne Aubert (Jr.)
Étienne Cardinal Aubert (Jr.) (died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiocese of Limoges, France
Death PlaceViterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Viterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

  • a priest for 1.7 years
  • a cardinal for 8.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Sep 1361
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 166

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Mar 2021

Quantcast