Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arnaud Aubert

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch, France


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Mar 1354AppointedBishop of Agde, France
14 Nov 1354AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
18 Jan 1357AppointedArchbishop of Auch, France
11 Jun 1371DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

MicroData Summary for Arnaud Aubert
Archbishop Arnaud Aubert (died ) Archbishop of Auch

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 166, and Page 121
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Mar 2021

Quantcast